Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0132 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 132
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 16-19-18.
77 Synopsis: Childhood obesity study topics. Establishes the childhood
88 obesity commission as a temporary commission to study childhood
99 obesity. Requires the commission to submit an annual report to the
1010 governor and the general assembly not later than June 30, 2026.
1111 Effective: July 1, 2025.
1212 Ford J.D.
1313 January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children
1414 Services.
1515 2025 IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 Introduced
1616 First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
1717 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
1818 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
1919 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2020 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2121 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2222 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2323 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2424 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2525 between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2626 SENATE BILL No. 132
2727 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
2828 health.
2929 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3030 1 SECTION 1. IC 16-19-18 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3131 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3232 3 JULY 1, 2025]:
3333 4 Chapter 18. Childhood Obesity Commission
3434 5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "commission" refers to the
3535 6 childhood obesity commission established by section 2 of this
3636 7 chapter.
3737 8 Sec. 2. The childhood obesity commission is established under
3838 9 the executive branch of state government as a temporary
3939 10 commission.
4040 11 Sec. 3. The purpose of the commission is to study childhood
4141 12 obesity and evaluate the following:
4242 13 (1) The state child care licensing structure and quality rating
4343 14 and improvement system (QRIS) as it relates to meeting the
4444 15 following specific standards:
4545 16 (A) Nutrition.
4646 17 (B) Active play.
4747 2025 IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 2
4848 1 (C) Sugary drink.
4949 2 (D) Screen time.
5050 3 (2) Indiana's regulatory systems, as a whole, for robust
5151 4 nutrition or physical activity requirements.
5252 5 (3) The use of a state health savings account to allow
5353 6 individuals to buy fruits and vegetables.
5454 7 (4) Medicaid coverage for the following:
5555 8 (A) Obesity medication.
5656 9 (B) A diabetes prevention program.
5757 10 (C) Exercise prescriptions.
5858 11 (D) Evidence based practices such as food and medicine to
5959 12 produce prescriptions.
6060 13 (5) Indiana's recess requirements for:
6161 14 (A) strengthening physical activity; and
6262 15 (B) increasing minutes for physical activity.
6363 16 (6) Physical education requirements for all grades.
6464 17 (7) Limiting physical education waivers.
6565 18 (8) Any other topic that the commission determines is
6666 19 appropriate.
6767 20 Sec. 4. (a) The commission consists of the following ten (10)
6868 21 members:
6969 22 (1) One (1) individual appointed by the governor who serves
7070 23 as a voting member.
7171 24 (2) Four (4) legislative members serving as nonvoting
7272 25 members appointed as follows:
7373 26 (A) One (1) member appointed by the president pro
7474 27 tempore of the senate.
7575 28 (B) One (1) member appointed by the speaker of the house
7676 29 of representatives.
7777 30 (C) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
7878 31 the senate.
7979 32 (D) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
8080 33 the house of representatives.
8181 34 (3) The chief medical officer for the state department, or the
8282 35 chief medical officer's designee, who serves as a voting
8383 36 member.
8484 37 (4) The secretary of family and social services, or the
8585 38 secretary's designee, who serves as a voting member.
8686 39 (5) The secretary of education, or the secretary's designee,
8787 40 who serves as a voting member.
8888 41 (6) A school superintendent appointed by the governor who
8989 42 serves as a voting member.
9090 2025 IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 3
9191 1 (7) One (1) individual who:
9292 2 (A) is a licensed pediatrician; and
9393 3 (B) specializes in childhood obesity;
9494 4 appointed by the governor who serves as a voting member.
9595 5 (b) A member appointed under subsection (a) serves for the
9696 6 duration of the commission and serves at the will of the member's
9797 7 appointing authority.
9898 8 Sec. 5. (a) The governor shall designate a member of the
9999 9 commission to serve as chairperson of the commission.
100100 10 (b) A chairperson serves at the will of the governor.
101101 11 Sec. 6. The commission meets at the call of the chairperson.
102102 12 Sec. 7. Six (6) members of the commission constitute a quorum.
103103 13 The affirmative vote of a majority of the voting members is
104104 14 required to take any action.
105105 15 Sec. 8. The state department shall staff the commission.
106106 16 Sec. 9. (a) Each member of the commission who is not a state
107107 17 employee is entitled to the minimum salary per diem provided by
108108 18 IC 4-10-11-2.1(b). The member is also entitled to reimbursement
109109 19 for mileage, traveling expenses as provided under IC 4-13-1-4, and
110110 20 other expenses actually incurred in connection with the member's
111111 21 duties as provided in the state policies and procedures established
112112 22 by the Indiana department of administration and approved by the
113113 23 budget agency.
114114 24 (b) Each member of the commission who is a state employee is
115115 25 entitled to reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
116116 26 IC 4-13-1-4 and other expenses actually incurred in connection
117117 27 with the member's duties as provided in the state policies and
118118 28 procedures established by the Indiana department of
119119 29 administration and approved by the budget agency.
120120 30 (c) Each member of the commission who is a member of the
121121 31 general assembly is entitled to receive the same per diem, mileage,
122122 32 and travel allowances paid to members of the general assembly
123123 33 serving on interim study committees established by the legislative
124124 34 council. Per diem, mileage, and travel allowances paid under this
125125 35 subsection shall be paid from appropriations made to the
126126 36 legislative council or the legislative services agency.
127127 37 (d) Expenses paid under subsections (a) and (b) shall be paid
128128 38 from appropriations made to the state department.
129129 39 Sec. 10. The commission shall submit an annual report to the
130130 40 governor and the general assembly, in an electronic format under
131131 41 IC 5-14-6, not later than June 30, 2026. The report must include
132132 42 the commission's activities, findings, and recommendations for
133133 2025 IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 4
134134 1 legislation.
135135 2 Sec. 11. This chapter expires June 30, 2027.
136136 2025 IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148