Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0136 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 136
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 27-1.
77 Synopsis: Disclosures related to prescription drugs. Beginning
88 January 1, 2026, requires a state employee health plan, a policy of
99 accident and sickness insurance, and a health maintenance organization
1010 contract to provide to a covered individual the national average drug
1111 acquisition cost of a generic drug on the written materials provided at
1212 the point of sale. Provides that if an agreement between a health plan
1313 and a pharmacy benefit manager that is entered into or renewed after
1414 December 31, 2025, provides that less than 85% of the estimated
1515 rebates will be deducted from the cost of prescription drugs before a
1616 covered individual's cost sharing requirement is determined, the
1717 pharmacy benefit manager must provide the policyholder with a notice
1818 on an annual basis that includes: (1) an explanation of what a rebate is;
1919 (2) an explanation of how rebates accrue to the health plan from the
2020 manufacturer; and (3) the aggregate amount of rebates that accrued to
2121 the health plan for prescription drugs dispensed under the
2222 policyholder's health plan for the previous year.
2323 Effective: July 1, 2025.
2424 Bohacek
2525 January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
2626 Services.
2727 2025 IN 136—LS 6329/DI 154 Introduced
2828 First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
2929 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
3030 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
3131 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
3232 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
3333 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
3434 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
3535 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3636 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3737 between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3838 SENATE BILL No. 136
3939 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
4040 insurance.
4141 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
4242 1 SECTION 1. IC 27-1-24.6 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
4343 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
4444 3 JULY 1, 2025]:
4545 4 Chapter 24.6. Disclosure of Negotiated Rate
4646 5 Sec. 1. This chapter applies to generic drugs covered under a
4747 6 health plan and dispensed or administered to a covered individual
4848 7 after December 31, 2025.
4949 8 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "covered individual" means an
5050 9 individual who is entitled to coverage under a health plan.
5151 10 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "generic drug" has the meaning
5252 11 set forth in IC 27-1-24.5-4.
5353 12 Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "health plan" means the
5454 13 following:
5555 14 (1) A state employee health plan (as described in IC 5-10-8-7).
5656 15 (2) A policy of accident and sickness insurance (as defined in
5757 16 IC 27-8-5-1).
5858 17 (3) An individual contract (as defined in IC 27-13-1-21) or a
5959 2025 IN 136—LS 6329/DI 154 2
6060 1 group contract (as defined in IC 27-13-1-16).
6161 2 Sec. 5. As used in this chapter, "national average drug
6262 3 acquisition cost" means the average price pharmacies pay for a
6363 4 prescription drug. The term does not include a dispensing fee or a
6464 5 professional fee.
6565 6 Sec. 6. A health plan must provide the amount of the national
6666 7 average drug acquisition cost for a generic drug on the written
6767 8 materials provided to the covered individual at the point of sale of
6868 9 the generic drug.
6969 10 SECTION 2. IC 27-1-24.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
7070 11 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
7171 12 JULY 1, 2025]:
7272 13 Chapter 24.7. Disclosure of Rebates
7373 14 Sec. 1. This chapter applies to an agreement between a
7474 15 pharmacy benefit manager and a health plan regarding
7575 16 prescription drugs that is entered into, renewed, or renegotiated
7676 17 after December 31, 2025. This chapter does not apply to a health
7777 18 plan, with point of sale rebates, if at least eighty-five percent (85%)
7878 19 of the estimated rebates are deducted from the cost of prescription
7979 20 drugs dispensed at a pharmacy or via mail order before a covered
8080 21 individual's cost sharing requirement is determined.
8181 22 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "covered individual" means an
8282 23 individual who is entitled to coverage under a health plan.
8383 24 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "health plan" means the
8484 25 following:
8585 26 (1) A state employee health plan (as described in IC 5-10-8-7).
8686 27 (2) A policy of accident and sickness insurance (as defined in
8787 28 IC 27-8-5-1).
8888 29 (3) An individual contract (as defined in IC 27-13-1-21) and a
8989 30 group contract (as defined in IC 27-13-1-16).
9090 31 (4) Any other plan or program that provides payment,
9191 32 reimbursement, or indemnification to a covered individual for
9292 33 the cost of prescription drugs.
9393 34 Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "policyholder" means an
9494 35 individual in whose name a health plan is held.
9595 36 Sec. 5. As used in this chapter, "prescription drug" means a
9696 37 controlled substance or a legend drug (as defined in
9797 38 IC 16-18-2-199).
9898 39 Sec. 6. (a) As used in this chapter, "rebate" means a discount or
9999 40 other price concession that is:
100100 41 (1) based on the use of a prescription drug; and
101101 42 (2) paid by a manufacturer or a third party to a pharmacy
102102 2025 IN 136—LS 6329/DI 154 3
103103 1 benefit manager (as defined in IC 27-1-24.5-12), pharmacy
104104 2 services administrative organization (as defined in
105105 3 IC 27-1-24.5-15), or pharmacy (as defined in IC 27-1-24.5-11)
106106 4 after a claim has been processed and paid at a pharmacy.
107107 5 (b) The term includes an incentive and a disbursement.
108108 6 Sec. 7. An agreement to which this chapter applies must contain
109109 7 a contractual provision that requires the pharmacy benefit
110110 8 manager to provide on an annual basis, not later than sixty (60)
111111 9 days after the end of each policy year, a notice to a policyholder
112112 10 that states the following:
113113 11 (1) An explanation of what a rebate is.
114114 12 (2) An explanation of how rebates accrue to a health plan
115115 13 from a manufacturer.
116116 14 (3) The aggregate amount of rebates for all prescription drugs
117117 15 dispensed or administered to covered individuals on the
118118 16 policyholder's health plan that accrued to the health plan
119119 17 during the previous policy year. This information may not
120120 18 include any information about an individual prescription
121121 19 drug, including the name, manufacturer, quantity, or dosage
122122 20 of a prescription drug.
123123 21 The notice required by this section may be provided by first class
124124 22 mail or electronic mail.
125125 2025 IN 136—LS 6329/DI 154