Indiana 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0178 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+*ES0178.1*
2+March 13, 2025
3+ENGROSSED
4+SENATE BILL No. 178
5+_____
6+DIGEST OF SB 178 (Updated March 11, 2025 12:49 pm - DI 101)
7+Citations Affected: IC 8-1.
8+Synopsis: Natural gas and propane as clean energy resources. Provides
9+that it is the continuing policy of the state to recognize natural gas and
10+propane as "clean energy" or "green energy" for purposes of any state
11+or federal program that provides funding or other incentives for: (1)
12+clean energy initiatives or projects; (2) green energy initiatives or
13+projects; or (3) any similarly designated initiatives or projects; in
14+Indiana. Defines "clean energy" or "green energy" for these purposes.
15+Specifies that the term: (1) includes natural gas and propane, wind
16+energy, solar energy, photovoltaic cells and panels, hydropower, fuel
17+cells, hydrogen, geothermal energy, and nuclear energy; and (2) does
18+not affect certain existing definitions set forth in the Indiana Code.
19+Effective: July 1, 2025.
20+Buck, Koch, Doriot, Donato, Byrne,
21+Leising, Baldwin,
22+Randolph Lonnie M, Tomes
23+(HOUSE SPONSORS — MILLER D, PRESCOTT, BURTON)
24+January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities.
25+February 6, 2025, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
26+February 13, 2025, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed.
27+February 14, 2025, engrossed.
28+February 17, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 43, nays 4.
29+HOUSE ACTION
30+March 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and
31+Telecommunications.
32+March 13, 2025, reported — Do Pass.
33+ES 178—LS 6540/DI 101 March 13, 2025
134 First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
235 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
336 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
437 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
538 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
639 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
740 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
841 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
942 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
1043 between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
11-SENATE ENROLLED ACT No. 178
12-AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning utilities.
44+ENGROSSED
45+SENATE BILL No. 178
46+A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
47+utilities.
1348 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
14-SECTION 1. IC 8-1-2-0.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
15-AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
16-1, 2025]: Sec. 0.7. (a) Except as provided in subsection (c), as used
17-in this section, "clean energy" or "green energy" means an energy
18-resource:
49+1 SECTION 1. IC 8-1-2-0.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
50+2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
51+3 1, 2025]: Sec. 0.7. (a) Except as provided in subsection (c), as used
52+4 in this section, "clean energy" or "green energy" means an energy
53+5 resource:
54+6 (1) with respect to which the emissions produced or released,
55+7 when the energy resource is used as a generation source or in
56+8 any other application:
57+9 (A) do not exceed the standard emissions levels associated
58+10 with pipeline quality natural gas; and
59+11 (B) release reduced air pollutants, relative to one (1) or
60+12 more types of fossil fuels; or
61+13 (2) that is recognized as:
62+14 (A) a "clean energy" resource; or
63+15 (B) a "green energy" resource;
64+16 or by another similar designation, by the United States
65+17 Environmental Protection Agency.
66+ES 178—LS 6540/DI 101 2
67+1 The term includes natural gas and propane, wind energy, solar
68+2 energy, photovoltaic cells and panels, hydropower, fuel cells,
69+3 hydrogen, geothermal energy, and nuclear energy.
70+4 (b) The general assembly declares that it is the continuing policy
71+5 of the state to recognize natural gas and propane as clean energy
72+6 or green energy for purposes of any state or federal program that
73+7 provides funding or other incentives for:
74+8 (1) clean energy initiatives or projects;
75+9 (2) green energy initiatives or projects; or
76+10 (3) any similarly designated initiatives or projects;
77+11 in Indiana.
78+12 (c) This section does not affect the following:
79+13 (1) The definition of "clean energy vehicle" set forth in
80+14 IC 5-22-5-8.5.
81+15 (2) The definition of "clean energy projects" set forth in
82+16 IC 8-1-8.8-2.
83+17 (3) The definition of "renewable energy resources" set forth
84+18 in IC 8-1-8.8-10.
85+19 (4) The definition of "clean energy resource" set forth in
86+20 IC 8-1-37-4.
87+ES 178—LS 6540/DI 101 3
88+COMMITTEE REPORT
89+Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Utilities, to which was
90+referred Senate Bill No. 178, has had the same under consideration and
91+begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the
92+recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
93+Page 1, line 4, after "an energy" insert "resource:
1994 (1) with respect to which the emissions produced or released,
2095 when the energy resource is used as a generation source or in
2196 any other application:
2297 (A) do not exceed the standard emissions levels associated
2398 with pipeline quality natural gas; and
2499 (B) release reduced air pollutants, relative to one (1) or
25100 more types of fossil fuels; or
26101 (2) that is recognized as:
27102 (A) a "clean energy" resource; or
28103 (B) a "green energy" resource;
29104 or by another similar designation, by the United States
30-Environmental Protection Agency.
31-The term includes natural gas and propane, wind energy, solar
32-energy, photovoltaic cells and panels, hydropower, fuel cells,
33-hydrogen, geothermal energy, and nuclear energy.
34-(b) The general assembly declares that it is the continuing policy
35-of the state to recognize natural gas and propane as clean energy
36-SEA 178 2
37-or green energy for purposes of any state or federal program that
38-provides funding or other incentives for:
39-(1) clean energy initiatives or projects;
40-(2) green energy initiatives or projects; or
41- (3) any similarly designated initiatives or projects;
42-in Indiana.
43-(c) This section does not affect the following:
44-(1) The definition of "clean energy vehicle" set forth in
45-IC 5-22-5-8.5.
46-(2) The definition of "clean energy projects" set forth in
47-IC 8-1-8.8-2.
48-(3) The definition of "renewable energy resources" set forth
49-in IC 8-1-8.8-10.
50-(4) The definition of "clean energy resource" set forth in
51-IC 8-1-37-4.
52-SEA 178 President of the Senate
53-President Pro Tempore
54-Speaker of the House of Representatives
55-Governor of the State of Indiana
56-Date: Time:
57-SEA 178
105+Environmental Protection Agency.".
106+ Page 1, delete lines 5 through 11.
107+Page 1, line 12, delete "gas." and insert "gas and propane.".
108+Page 1, line 14, after "gas" insert "and propane".
109+and when so amended that said bill do pass.
110+(Reference is to SB 178 as introduced.)
111+KOCH, Chairperson
112+Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 2.
113+_____
114+SENATE MOTION
115+Mr. President: I move that Senate Bill 178 be amended to read as
116+follows:
117+Page 2, line 1, delete "propane." and insert "propane, wind energy,
118+solar energy, photovoltaic cells and panels, hydropower, fuel cells,
119+hydrogen, geothermal energy, and nuclear energy.".
120+(Reference is to SB 178 as printed February 7, 2025.)
121+BUCK
122+ES 178—LS 6540/DI 101 4
123+COMMITTEE REPORT
124+Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Utilities, Energy and
125+Telecommunications, to which was referred Senate Bill 178, has had
126+the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back
127+to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass.
128+(Reference is to SB 178 as reprinted February 14, 2025.)
129+SOLIDAY
130+Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 3
131+ES 178—LS 6540/DI 101