Senate
|
04/24/2025
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 415: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2025
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2025
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Senator Jackson added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Olthoff, Moseley, Garcia Wilburn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
House sponsor: Representative Cash
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 30, nays 19
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Amendment #4 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2025
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Senators Niezgodski, Doriot, Walker G, Hunley, Donato added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2025
|
Senator Rogers added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Authored by Senator Pol
|
|
|