Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 6, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | House Hearing: Monday, January 23, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 01/13/2023 | House Introduced |