House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in Committee | ||
House | 01/12/2024 | House Hearing: Friday, January 12, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 546-S - CANCELED | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | House Introduced |