House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 10, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 7, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Reengrossed on Tuesday, April 30, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 108 Nay: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Representative Rahjes, Representative Moser, and Representative Carlin are appointed to replace Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Kessler, and Representative Hoye on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
House Representative Carpenter, W., Representative Kessler, and Representative Hoye are appointed to replace Representative Rahjes, Representative Moser, and Representative Carlin on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Peck, Senator McGinn and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rahjes , Representative Moser and Representative Carlin as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Water; Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Water
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|