House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 20, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 86 Nay: 32
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Motion to Reconsider Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 56 Nay: 64
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 109 Nay: 12
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Howell was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Howell
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Elections
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Elections
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|