House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, May 12, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 5, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 83 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Williams, K. , Representative Landwehr and Representative Winn as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 83 Nay: 37
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Winn was rejected Yea: 37 Nay: 81
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Winn
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|