Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died on Senate Calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 9, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S | ||
Senate | 02/10/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | House Introduced |