House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Died in Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis and Representative Osman appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Representative Humphries, Representative Lewis, and Representative Osman are appointed to replace Representative Concannon, Representative Johnson, and Representative Ousley on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Concannon , Representative Johnson and Representative Ousley as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 9, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|