House
|
04/30/2024
|
House No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Thursday, May 16, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 7, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, May 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 91 Nay: 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 3(f) Distribution of CCR Copies passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer appointed as third conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as third conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Peck and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 23 Nay: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Motion to adopt the Conference Committee Report. Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a new conference failed. Yea: 19 Nay: 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Senate Senator Tyson, Senator Peck, and Senator Holland are appointed to replace Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg, and Senator Holscher on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Representative Smith, A., Representative Bergkamp, and Representative Sawyer are appointed to replace Representative Sutton, Representative Penn, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Sutton , Representative Penn and Representative Neighbor as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 1, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|