LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2108
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2108
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2108
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died in Committee
House
02/02/2023
House Hearing: Thursday, February 2, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
House
02/01/2023
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S - CANCELED
House
01/19/2023
House Referred to Committee on Taxation
House
01/19/2023
House Introduced