House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Gossage, Senator Erickson and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Landwehr , Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Straub was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Straub
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 5
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Engrossed on Tuesday, February 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jacobs was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|