House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 107 Nay: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 32 Nay: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Humphries , Representative Lewis and Representative Osman as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Corson was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Corson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Warren was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Warren
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 23, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 1, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|