House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:01 AM Room 582-N | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | House Introduced |