LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2167
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2167
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2167
Action History
House
02/23/2023
House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
House
02/22/2023
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections
House
02/14/2023
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
House
01/25/2023
House Referred to Committee on Elections
House
01/25/2023
House Introduced