Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 143 overridden; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Motion to override line item veto failed; Line item veto 138(f) sustained; Yea: 21 Nay: 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 42(a) overridden; Yea: 29 Nay: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 39(e) overridden; Yea: 28 Nay: 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 143 overridden; Yea: 84 Nay: 40
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 138f overridden; Yea: 84 Nay: 40
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto failed; Line item veto 115h sustained; Yea: 79 Nay: 45
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto failed; Line item veto 115a 116a sustained; Yea: 76 Nay: 48
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 42a overridden; Yea: 86 Nay: 38
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto prevailed; Line item veto 39e overridden; Yea: 85 Nay: 39
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
House Motion to override line item veto failed; Line item veto 15b sustained; Yea: 82 Nay: 42
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor except line item veto of 15(b); 25(b); 26(d); 31(c); 39(e);4 2(a),(b),(d); 43(b),(c); 44(b),(c); 45(b),(c); 46(b),(c); 72(b); 89(b); 90(b); 115(a),(b),(h),(i); 116(a); 118(a); 138(f); 143 on Thursday, April 20, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 79 Nay: 44
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Representative Waymaster, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Helgerson are appointed to replace Representative Hoffman, Representative Rhiley, and Representative Amyx on the Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Billinger, Senator Claeys and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hoffman , Representative Rhiley and Representative Amyx as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, March 6, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on General Government Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 281-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 281-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on General Government Budget
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|