House | 04/30/2024 | House Died on Calendar | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House Hearing: Monday, February 19, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 152-S | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 152-S | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | House Introduced |