House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Tuesday, April 18, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Schreiber and Representative Carmichael as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 34 Nay: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 7, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|