House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 13, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was rejected Yea: 9 Nay: 22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Senator Francisco raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Senator Olson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Shallenburger
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 15, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 9:01 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
House Hearing: Thursday, February 9, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N - CANCELED
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|