House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 78 Nay: 45
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Monday, April 24, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 76 Nay: 46
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Thomas , Representative Estes and Representative Stogsdill as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 23 Nay: 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Senator Baumgardner raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 9, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 75 Nay: 47
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Engrossed on Thursday, February 23, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 8, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|