Division of the Budget Landon State Office Building Phone: (785) 296-2436 900 SW Jackson Street, Room 504 adam.c.proffitt@ks.gov Topeka, KS 66612 http://budget.kansas.gov Adam Proffitt, Director Laura Kelly, Governor Division of the Budget March 6, 2023 The Honorable Nick Hoheisel, Chairperson House Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions 300 SW 10th Avenue, Room 582-N Topeka, Kansas 66612 Dear Representative Hoheisel: SUBJECT: Fiscal Note for HB 2252 by House Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions In accordance with KSA 75-3715a, the following fiscal note concerning HB 2252 is respectfully submitted to your committee. Under current law, the KPERS, Kansas Police and Fireman’s, and Judges retirement plans do not include a cost-of-living adjustment (COLA). HB 2252 would provide a permanent, ad hoc COLA for retirees who have been retired for at least five years, as of July 1, 2022. The COLA would be structured to provide the following: Retirement Ad Hoc Date Before COLA July 1, 2018 1.0% July 1, 2015 2.0% July 1, 2012 3.0% July 1, 2009 4.0% July 1, 2006 5.0% The bill would cap the benefit from any COLA authorized with the bill at $200 per month. In addition, the bill would authorize a COLA for KPERS members on long-term disability. According to the KPERS actuary, the enactment of SB 198 would make 90,969 retirees and beneficiaries (or 82.3 percent of the 110,586 KPERS retirees and beneficiaries, as of the December 31, 2021, actuarial valuation) eligible for a COLA. The KPERS actuary completed a cost study of the COLA proposal and estimates the bill would increase the unfunded actuarial liability by $353.5 million for all KPERS retirement plans under current actuarial assumptions. The Honorable Nick Hoheisel, Chairperson Page 2—HB 2252 Although the bill does not specify the length of the amortization period to fund the COLA, the actuary assumed an amortization period of 15 years. The following table summarizes the actuarial cost analysis by group: Estimated Fiscal Effect Dollars in Millions Employer Additional UAL Contribution First Year KPERS Group Increase Rate Increase Contribution State/School $254.4 0.42 % $22.6 KP&F—State 6.7 1.08 % 0.6 Judges 2.5 0.86 % 0.3 Subtotal—State $263.6 $23.5 Local 48.3 0.21 % 4.3 KP&F—Local 41.7 0.86 % 3.7 Subtotal—Local $ 90.0 $ 8.0 Total $353.6 $31.5 The Division of the Budget notes that instead of amortizing the UAL over 15 years, the state could choose to fund its portion of the UAL increase with a lump-sum payment of $263.6 million from the State General Fund to KPERS for the state groups in FY 2024. With this scenario, the state would not have an additional employer contribution rate increase associated with the COLA or additional first-year contributions, as shown in the above table. Any fiscal effect associated with HB 2252 is not reflected in The FY 2024 Governor’s Budget Report. Sincerely, Adam Proffitt Director of the Budget cc: Jarod Waltner, KPERS