Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 23, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 1 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Hearing: Monday, February 6, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 112-N | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Introduced |