House | 04/03/2023 | House Approved by Governor on Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | House Hearing: Monday, February 6, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 112-N | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | House Introduced |