House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on K-12 Education Budget | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 546-S | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | House Introduced |