Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Senate Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 20, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 91 Nay: 32
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Murphy was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Representative Sutton raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter, W. was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter, W.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hougland was rejected Yea: 36 Nay: 79
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hougland
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carr was rejected Yea: 35 Nay: 80
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carr
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Featherston was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Featherston
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Miller, V. was rejected Yea: 50 Nay: 71
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion by Rep. V. Miller to suspend House Rule 2110 was rejected. Yea: 36 Nay: 75
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Representative Waymaster challenged the amendment under the Pay-Go provision of House Rule 2110. The amendment was ruled to be out of order
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Miller, V.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Woodard was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Woodard
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Alcala was rejected
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Alcala
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Landwehr was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Landwehr
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was rejected Yea: 38 Nay: 78
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Helgerson
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|