LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2300
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2300
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2300
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died on Calendar
House
03/25/2024
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
House
03/13/2024
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
House
02/06/2023
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
House
02/06/2023
House Introduced