LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2329
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2329
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2329
Action History
House
02/23/2023
House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
House
02/16/2023
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
House
02/14/2023
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
House
02/07/2023
House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
House
02/07/2023
House Introduced