LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2334
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2334
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2334
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died in Committee
House
03/01/2023
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
House
02/15/2023
House Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
House
02/14/2023
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
House
02/07/2023
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
House
02/07/2023
House Introduced