House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Kloos and Senator Corson appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Francis , Representative Neelly and Representative Ballard as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Engrossed on Friday, February 24, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 5
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|