House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 81 Nay: 42
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Wednesday, April 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 77 Nay: 46
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Erickson, Senator Dietrich and Senator Holland appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Landwehr , Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pettey was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pettey
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator O'Shea was adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator O'Shea
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 114 Nay: 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|