House
|
04/30/2024
|
House Died in Conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Howe , Representative Blew and Representative Woodard as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, March 13, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Higher Education Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 281-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Higher Education Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|