LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2380
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2380
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2380
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died in Committee
House
03/01/2023
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
House
02/21/2023
House Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
House
02/15/2023
House Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
House
02/09/2023
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
House
02/09/2023
House Introduced