House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 14, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 15, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 14, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|