Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Senate Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 91 Nay: 33
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ballard
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Representative Featherston raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Featherston
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sawyer Clayton
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Ruling of the chair was sustained
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Representative Schmoe raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hoye
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, March 7, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|