Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | House Engrossed on Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 112-N | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Introduced |