Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House Introduced |