Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 28 Nay: 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 85 Nay: 40
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Vetoed by Governor; Returned to House on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Reengrossed on Tuesday, April 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Concurred with amendments; Yea: 82 Nay: 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 27 Nay: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 85 Nay: 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, March 22, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Xu was rejected Yea: 37 Nay: 82
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Xu
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Representative Miller, S. raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, March 8, 2023, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
House Introduced
|
|
|