LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2455
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2455
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2455
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died on Calendar
House
03/17/2023
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
House
03/14/2023
House Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
House
03/09/2023
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
House
03/09/2023
House Introduced