LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2482
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2482
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2482
Action History
House
02/23/2024
House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
House
02/09/2024
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
House
02/06/2024
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
House
01/08/2024
House Referred to Committee on Transportation
House
01/08/2024
House Introduced
House
01/08/2024
House Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, December 13, 2023