House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 12, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Monday, March 18, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 28, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 5, 2024
|
|
|