LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2492
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2492
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2492
Action History
House
04/30/2024
House Died in Committee
House
04/25/2024
House Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
House
04/05/2024
House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
House
03/21/2024
House Withdrawn from Committee on Health and Human Services; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
House
01/10/2024
House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
House
01/10/2024
House Introduced