LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Kansas KS
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2519
Action History
KS
Kansas House Bill HB2519
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Kansas 2023-2024 Regular Session
Kansas House Bill HB2519
Action History
House
02/23/2024
House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
House
02/21/2024
House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Elections
House
02/15/2024
House Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
House
01/17/2024
House Referred to Committee on Elections
House
01/17/2024
House Introduced