House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 6, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Engrossed on Wednesday, February 21, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Concannon was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Concannon
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
House Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|