House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Friday, April 19, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Engrossed on Monday, April 8, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Conference committee report now available
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Hoheisel , Representative Clifford and Representative Xu as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
House Hearing: Monday, February 5, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|