House | 04/30/2024 | House Died in Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Interstate Cooperation; Rereferred to Committee on Calendar and Printing | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Calendar and Printing; Rereferred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Interstate Cooperation; Referred to Committee on Calendar and Printing | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | House Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Referred to Committee on Interstate Cooperation | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Taxation | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | House Introduced |