Senate | 04/30/2024 | Senate Died in Senate Committee | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Senate Received and Introduced | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | House Hearing: Tuesday, February 13, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 582-N | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | House Introduced |