House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Reengrossed on Friday, April 5, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Peck, Senator McGinn and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Rahjes , Representative Moser and Representative Carlin as conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2024
|
Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Senate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, March 12, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Engrossed on Monday, February 26, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
House Hearing: Thursday, February 1, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|