Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Died in Senate Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate Received and Introduced
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Engrossed on Friday, March 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 113 Nay: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wasinger was adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wasinger
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
House Hearing: Tuesday, February 6, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
House Introduced
|
|
|